NY A07187 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.490
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical corrections to certain provisions of the general municipal law relating to the temporary state commission on local government ethics and repeals railroad aid bond provisions.
Title
Makes technical corrections to certain provisions of the general municipal law relating to the temporary state commission on local government ethics and repeals railroad aid bond provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Michael Montesano [R] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Asm. James Brennan [D] | Asm. Jose Rivera [D] | Asm. Michael Simanowitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.490 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.442 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5647 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.345 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.252 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05647 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7187