NY A07091 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
Pending: Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric vehicle charging stations and electric vehicle capable parking spaces to have handicap accessible spaces that are large enough to accommodate such wheelchair accessible electric vehicles, including but not limited to, vans and minivans.
Title
Requires electric vehicle charging stations and electric vehicle capable parking spaces to have handicap accessible spaces that are large enough to accommodate such wheelchair accessible electric vehicles, including but not limited to, vans and minivans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.382 |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S08979 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS