NY A06164 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.568
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to financial guaranty insurance single risk limits for municipal obligation bonds, special revenue bonds and similar obligations of debt issuers in highly rated member countries of the Organisation of Economic Co-operation and Development; makes certain technical corrections.
Title
Relates to financial guaranty insurance single risk limits for municipal obligation bonds, special revenue bonds and similar obligations of debt issuers in highly rated member countries of the Organisation of Economic Co-operation and Development; makes certain technical corrections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.568 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1184 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3612 |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.377 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.377 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03612 (Same As) 2023-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6164