NY A05564 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - print number 5564b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - print number 5564b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the bridge over the Sagtikos Parkway constituting the Crooked Hill Road Overpass in the town of Islip, county of Suffolk, the "Senior Investigator Thomas M. O'Neill Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates the bridge over the Sagtikos Parkway constituting the Crooked Hill Road Overpass in the town of Islip, county of Suffolk, the "Senior Investigator Thomas M. O'Neill Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Asm. Keith Brown [R] | Asm. Eric Brown [R] | Asm. Joseph Angelino [R] | Asm. Robert Smullen [R] |
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Stephen Hawley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Assembly | print number 5564b |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | print number 5564a |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09262 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - 2ND REPORT CAL.