NY A04422 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - 3RD READING CAL.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-17 - 3RD READING CAL.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The bill adds community college faculty representation to the State University Board of Trustees.
Title
An act to amend the education law, in relation to the membership of the board of trustees of the state university of New York
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | 3RD READING CAL.353 | |
2010-06-17 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1656 | |
2010-06-16 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2010-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2010-06-16 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-16 | ordered to third reading rules cal.172 | |
2010-06-16 | rules report cal.172 | |
2010-06-16 | reported | |
2010-06-08 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-01-06 | referred to higher education | |
2009-02-04 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S1656 (Same As) -