NY A04330 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-19 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes special provisions for recycling of ionization smoke detectors and requires manufacturers to create a waste acceptance program for ionization smoke detectors.
Title
Establishes special provisions for recycling of ionization smoke detectors and requires manufacturers to create a waste acceptance program for ionization smoke detectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | print number 4330b |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | print number 4330a |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2011-02-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06574 (Same As) 2012-02-29 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION