NY A03751 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
Pending: Senate Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to price gouging of medicine.
Title
Relates to price gouging of medicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.183 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3751b |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2013-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3751a |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.310 |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-29 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02138 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION