NY A02678 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "consumer credit fairness act"; establishes a 3 year statute of limitations for commencement of a cause of action arising out of a consumer credit transaction where the defendant is a purchaser, borrower or debtor; establishes a notice of lawsuit which must be mailed to the defendant in such a cause of action; establishes certain requirements for the complaint in such an action; provides for arbitration of such actions; requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.
Title
Enacts the "consumer credit fairness act"; establishes a 3 year statute of limitations for commencement of a cause of action arising out of a consumer credit transaction where the defendant is a purchaser, borrower or debtor; establishes a notice of lawsuit which must be mailed to the defendant in such a cause of action; establishes certain requirements for the complaint in such an action; provides for arbitration of such actions; requires debt collectors to send consumers a written notice of their rights under state law along with their initial debt collection correspondence; such notice would contain information such as who and when a principal creditor may contact a debtor about the debt owed as well as the fact that a principal creditor cannot disclose information affecting a consumer debtor's reputation for creditworthiness if the principal creditor knows or has reason to know such information is false; applies to consumer rather than commercial debts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-03-11 | Assembly | recommitted to judiciary |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.151 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.64 |
2013-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2013-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02454 (Same As) 2014-03-10 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
A09053 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
A09053 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY