NY A02408 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - print number 2408b
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-14 - print number 2408b
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a nonpartisan poll monitoring program.
Title
Establishes a nonpartisan poll monitoring program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-14 | Assembly | print number 2408b |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | print number 2408a |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S05193 (Same As) 2024-05-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5193B