NY A02268 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-03 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-03 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING
Pending: Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the qualifications of members of the gaming commission.
Title
Relates to the qualifications of members of the gaming commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.467 |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | committed to racing and wagering |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.129 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-03-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.63 |
2013-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S07412 (Same As) 2014-05-14 - REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING