NY A02092 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - RECOMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-06 - RECOMMITTED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Title
Prohibits the manufacture, transport, shipment or possession of an undetectable knife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO CODES |
2014-05-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2092a |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-04-29 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.118 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.30 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.30 |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2013-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S04784 (Same As) 2014-06-05 - PRINT NUMBER 4784A