NY A00896 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 896b
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 896b
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Replaces the words addict or addicts with the words person with substance use disorder or a variation thereof.
Title
Replaces the words addict or addicts with the words person with substance use disorder or a variation thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Emily Gallagher [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Keith Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Assembly | print number 896b |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2023-05-05 | Assembly | print number 896a |
2023-05-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S05485 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING