NY A00156 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.463
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.463
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transmitters of money to provide a warning which informs consumers of certain fraudulent activities that may occur.
Title
Requires transmitters of money to provide a warning which informs consumers of certain fraudulent activities that may occur.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.463 |
2014-02-26 | Assembly | reported |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.398 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.398 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | print number 156a |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S00606 (Same As) 2014-05-07 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE