NY A00134 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-02 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for payment of bonuses to veterans of the Korean war.
Title
Provides for payment of bonuses to veterans of the Korean war.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2014-04-25 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | print number 134a |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2014-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S00179 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION
S00179 (Same As) 2014-05-05 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S00179 (Same As) 2014-05-05 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY