NV SB341 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-05 - Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a subcommittee to conduct an interim study concerning the establishment of a bank that is owned, controlled and operated by this State. (BDR S-870)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a subcommittee to conduct an interim study concerning the establishment of a bank that is owned, controlled and operated by this State. (BDR S-870)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate Final Passage (Y: 10 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-05 Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)
2011-06-04 Read second time.
2011-06-03 From committee: Do pass.
2011-04-08 EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).
2011-03-23 From printer. To committee.
2011-03-21 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback