NV SB190 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progress
Action: 2011-06-03 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the licensure of music therapists. (BDR 54-377)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the licensure of music therapists. (BDR 54-377)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-26 - Senate Final Passage (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-03 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 252.
2011-05-30 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-05-28 Assembly Amendment No. 721 concurred in. To enrollment.
2011-05-28 In Senate.
2011-05-28 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.) To Senate.
2011-05-27 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-26 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-05-26 From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2011-05-25 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 721.) To printer.
2011-05-25 Placed on Second Reading File.
2011-05-25 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-04-27 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.
2011-04-27 In Assembly.
2011-04-27 To Assembly.
2011-04-27 From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2011-04-26 To printer.
2011-04-26 Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.)
2011-04-26 Placed on General File.
2011-04-26 Reprinting dispensed with.
2011-04-26 Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 405.)
2011-04-25 From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2011-02-23 From printer. To committee.
2011-02-22 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback