NV AB351 | 2013 | 77th Legislature

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 19 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-25 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Legislative Committee on Health Care to study the laws prohibiting a person from having a specified amount of certain prohibited substances in his or her blood or urine while driving or being in actual physical control of a vehicle. (BDR S-733)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the Legislative Committee on Health Care to study the laws prohibiting a person from having a specified amount of certain prohibited substances in his or her blood or urine while driving or being in actual physical control of a vehicle. (BDR S-733)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-25Senate(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)
2013-05-24SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2013-05-24SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2013-05-24SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2013-05-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 835.) To printer.
2013-05-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2013-05-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2013-04-19SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2013-04-19SenateIn Senate.
2013-04-18AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 31, Nays: 8, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2013-04-17AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2013-04-16AssemblyRead second time.
2013-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2013-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2013-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback