NM SM98 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Native american medicaid coverage
Title
Native american medicaid coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | [LD 19] Signed by one or both houses |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Public Affairs |