NM SJM3 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic handouts for interim committees
Title
Electronic handouts for interim committees
Sponsors
Sen. John Sapien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP API. | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] HBIC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] PASSED/S (37-1) | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP-SPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SRC/SPAC-SRC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=3&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM003.pdf |