NM SJM1 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lgbtq health disparities task force
Title
Lgbtq health disparities task force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (30-0) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Rules |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |