NM SB9 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric vehicle income tax credit
Title
Electric vehicle income tax credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (20-14) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted and then to a |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-23 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |