NM SB82 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - [LD 27] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-26 - [LD 27] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
County education gross receipts for bonds
Title
County education gross receipts for bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-26 | House | [LD 27] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-26 | House | [LD 27] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (26-14) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2014-01-21 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |