NM SB436 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.139.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oil & gas withholding info to legislature
Title
Oil & gas withholding info to legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.139. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HBIC/HTRC-HBIC- DP-HTRC- DP | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] w/drn | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SCONC/SFC-SCONC |