NM SB425 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] w/o rec-HAFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] w/o rec-HAFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Payment of school standards-based tests
Title
Payment of school standards-based tests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] w/o rec-HAFC API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HEC/HAFC-HEC | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP/a | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SEC/SFC-SEC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=425&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0425.pdf |