NM SB403 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] w/drn - PASSED/H (66-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] w/drn - PASSED/H (66-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Election code language standardization
Title
Election code language standardization
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] w/drn - PASSED/H (66-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.137. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HVEC/HJC-HVEC- DP-HJC | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (34-0) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SRC/SJC-SRC |