NM SB377 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] PASSED/H (66-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] PASSED/H (66-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.135.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional psych licensure requirements
Title
Professional psych licensure requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] PASSED/H (66-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.135. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HJC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP - PASSED/S (33-0) | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] SPAC/SJC-SPAC |