NM SB337 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.131.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Precinct consolidation for certain elections
Title
Precinct consolidation for certain elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (64-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.131. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HVEC- DP | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] fl/a- PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP/a | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SRC/SJC-SRC |