NM SB302 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Passed House (60-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Home & charter school student program units

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home & charter school student program units

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-11 - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate Final Passages (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Passed House (60-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.113.
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-03-05House[LD 36] Referred to House Education
2013-03-05House[LD 36] Assigned to House Education and then to House Appropriations & Finance
2013-02-15Senate[LD 24] Passed Senate (29-10)
2013-02-13Senate[LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-02-08Senate[LD 19] Referred to Senate Finance
2013-02-08Senate[LD 19] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-01-17Senate[LD 3] Referred to Senate Education
2013-01-17Senate[LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback