NM SB297 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Remove benefit caps for certain coverages
Title
Remove benefit caps for certain coverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] s/cncrd POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP/a - PASSED/H (65-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP-HJC | |
2011-02-19 | [LD 33] HHGAC/HJC-HHGAC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP/a | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SCORC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SPAC/SCORC-SPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=297&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0297.pdf |