NM SB254 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (54-14) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (54-14) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.76.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Consideration of crime conviction for jobs
Title
Consideration of crime conviction for jobs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (54-14) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.76. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP-HJC- DP | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] HLC/HJC-HLC | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP - PASSED/S (35-4) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] germane-SPAC | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] SCC/SPAC/SJC-SCC |