NM SB140 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (53-11) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 17 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-17 - [LD 20] Passed House (53-11) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 11.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax increment district base-years
Title
Tax increment district base-years
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 53 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-17 | House | [LD 20] Passed House (53-11) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 11. |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | [LD 7] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |