NM SB140 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] SGND (Mar.18) Ch. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] SGND (Mar.18) Ch. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Blood donor recognition license plates
Title
Blood donor recognition license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] SGND (Mar.18) Ch. 7. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] DP-HAFC | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HTPWC/HAFC-HTPWC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/S (35-0) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCORC/SFC-SCORC |