NM HJM3 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] SRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Health care practitioner credentialing
Title
Health care practitioner credentialing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] SRC API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP - PASSED/H (63-0) | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HBIC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=JM&legno=3&year=10 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/10%20Regular/memorials/house/HJM003.pdf |