NM HJM1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (28-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (28-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allow certain payments to military widows
Title
Allow certain payments to military widows
Sponsors
Sen. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (28-0) SGND. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] DP-SPAC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] SRC/SPAC-SRC | |
2011-02-03 | [LD 17] PASSED/H (54-0) | |
2011-01-30 | [LD 13] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HCPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |