NM HB54 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 52.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anesthesiology assistant definitions
Title
Anesthesiology assistant definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] h and then to cncrd SGND BY GOV (Apr. 7) Ch. 52. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-03-02 | Senate | [LD 30] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-02-02 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-02-04 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (38-28) |
2015-01-30 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] HBEC |
2015-01-28 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC |
2015-01-22 | House | [LD 3] HHC and then to HBEC |
2015-01-20 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |