NM HB440 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr. 7) Ch.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr. 7) Ch.115.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Advanced energy tax deduction for some leases
Title
Advanced energy tax deduction for some leases
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Garcia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (34-0) SGND (Apr. 7) Ch.115. | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP-SFC- w/drn | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SCONC/SFC-SCONC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DNP-CS/DP- PASSED/H (66-1) | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP-HTRC | |
2011-02-04 | [LD 18] HBIC/HTRC-HBIC |