NM HB40 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Affordable housing tax credit act definitions
Title
Affordable housing tax credit act definitions
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-14 | Senate | [LD 19] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (62-0) |
2014-02-04 | House | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-28 | House | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-01-21 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |