NM HB209 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-07 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regional Council Fund Match Requirement
Title
Regional Council Fund Match Requirement
Sponsors
Rep. Cathrynn Brown [R] | Rep. Meredith Dixon [D] | Rep. Susan Herrera [D] | Rep. Doreen Johnson [D] |
Rep. Rodney Montoya [R] | Rep. Kristina Ortez [D] | Rep. Debra Sarinana [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:65 N:0 |
2024-02-04 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-30 | House | HRDLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-25 | House | Sent to HRDLC - Referrals: HRDLC/HCEDC |
2024-01-25 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar, ordered printed and referred to |
2024-01-23 | House | Not Printed |