NM HB147 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Availability of agendas for public meetings
Title
Availability of agendas for public meetings
Sponsors
Rep. James Smith [R] | Rep. James Smith [R] | Rep. James Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] w/drn API. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP-SJC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] SPAC/SJC-SPAC | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2011-02-25 | [LD 39] DP/a | |
2011-02-09 | [LD 23] DP/a-HHGAC | |
2011-01-20 | [LD 3] HCPAC/HHGAC-HCPAC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=147&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0147.pdf |