NJ S817 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved P.L.2011, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved P.L.2011, c.42.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain patient data to be reported to DHSS under "Health Care Facility-Associated Infection Reporting and Prevention Act".
Title
Permits certain patient data to be reported to DHSS under "Health Care Facility-Associated Infection Reporting and Prevention Act".
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-17 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved P.L.2011, c.42. | |
2011-02-17 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) | |
2011-02-17 | Substituted for A2890 | |
2011-02-03 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee | |
2010-06-21 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2010-05-27 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2890 (Same As) 2011-02-17 - Substituted by S817