NJ S720 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4065
Note: Carry Over of previous A5168
Note: Carry Over of previous A5168
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DCPP to consult with Division of Developmental Disabilities following finding of child abuse or neglect to create services plan for person with developmental disability under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires DCPP to consult with Division of Developmental Disabilities following finding of child abuse or neglect to create services plan for person with developmental disability under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Burgess [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4065 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A5168 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4168 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A5168 (Carry Over) 2023-02-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4168 (Same As) 2024-04-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee