NJ S503 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S211
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities and school districts to contract for video monitoring systems to assist in enforcing law against unlawfully passing a school bus.
Title
Permits municipalities and school districts to contract for video monitoring systems to assist in enforcing law against unlawfully passing a school bus.
Sponsors
Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-4) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S503 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2338 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2338 (Same As) 2014-02-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee