NJ S3042 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1957
Note: Carry Over of previous S907
Note: Carry Over of previous S907
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Title
The "Liberty State Park Protection Act"; establishes Liberty State Park Advisory Committee and requirements concerning DEP actions related to Liberty State Park.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2488 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
A1957 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S907 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A1957 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Food Security Committee
S907 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3042 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3042_I1.HTM |