NJ S3005 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4360
Note: Carry Over of previous S1470
Note: Carry Over of previous S1470
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates grant program for business accelerator and incubator networks; transfers $1 million in societal benefits charge revenues to EDA to administer program.
Title
Creates grant program for business accelerator and incubator networks; transfers $1 million in societal benefits charge revenues to EDA to administer program.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2352 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A4360 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Transferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1470 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4360 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Transferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S1470 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3005 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3005_I1.HTM |