NJ S2751 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4135
Note: Carry Over of previous S1232
Note: Carry Over of previous S1232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs DEP to develop guidelines concerning State and local government purchase of goods made from recycled material.
Title
Directs DEP to develop guidelines concerning State and local government purchase of goods made from recycled material.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A575 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
A4135 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S1232 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4135 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S1232 (Carry Over) 2022-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2751 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2751_I1.HTM |