NJ S2578 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3365
Note: Carry Over of previous S1111
Note: Carry Over of previous S1111
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to make mobile units available to reduce service delays at overcrowded agencies.
Title
Requires MVC to make mobile units available to reduce service delays at overcrowded agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2729 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A3365 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1111 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3365 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S1111 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2578 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2578_I1.HTM |