NJ S2333 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Substituted by A3225 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-18 - Substituted by A3225 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for licensure of chiropractic assistants.
Title
Provides for licensure of chiropractic assistants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Senate | Substituted by A3225 (1R) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3225 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.283.