NJ S2310 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3663
Note: Carry Over of previous A3937
Note: Carry Over of previous A3937
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires transparency concerning compensation with promotional opportunities and in employment listings.
Title
Requires transparency concerning compensation with promotional opportunities and in employment listings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3663 (Carry Over) 2023-02-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A3937 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4151 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3937 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4151 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2310 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2310_I1.HTM |