NJ S2106 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A2481 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A2481 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides remedies for certain fraudulent financing statements.*
Title
Provides remedies for certain fraudulent financing statements.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted by A2481 (ACS/2R) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2481 (Same As) 2015-05-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.59.