NJ S1277 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2988
Note: Carry Over of previous A4280
Note: Carry Over of previous A4280
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes centralized directory for affordable and senior citizen housing.
Title
Establishes centralized directory for affordable and senior citizen housing.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2988 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A4280 (Carry Over) 2022-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3363 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A4280 (Carry Over) 2022-06-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3363 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee